Heidelberg, Universitätsarchiv, UAH M6
Matrikel der Universität Heidelberg 1386-1936: UAH M6: 1704-1810
— Heidelberg, 1704-1810
Cite this page
Please cite this page by using the following URL/DOI:
https://doi.org/10.11588/diglit.45033#0355
DOI Page / Citation link:
https://doi.org/10.11588/diglit.45033#0355
- Einband
- 38r-38v Agostino Steffani, Johannes Georg Fleck von Roseneck (Prorektor), 25. April 1704 - Dezember 1704
- 39r-40v Friedrich Gerhard von Lüneschlos (III), 31. Dezember 1705 - 18. Januar 1708
- 41r-41v Ludwig Christian Mieg (I), 18. Januar 1708 - 20. Dezember 1708
- 42r-42v Leonhard Rosmann, 20. Dezember 1708 - 20. Dezember 1709
- 43r-43v Daniel Nebel (I), 20. Dezember 1709 - 19. Dezember 1710
- 44r-44v Philipp Ludwig Pastoir (I), 19. Dezember 1710 - 18. Dezember 1711
- 45r-45v Melchior Kirchner, 18. Dezember 1711 - 20. Dezember 1712
- 46r-46v Johannes Bartholomäus Busch, 20. Dezember 1712 - 20. Dezember 1713
- 47r-48r Daniel Nebel (II), 20. Dezember 1713 - 18. Dezember 1714
- 48r-49v Valentin Hoeglein, 18. Dezember 1714 - 20. Dezember 1715
- 50r-51v Johannes Christian Kirchmejer, 20. Dezember 1715 - 19. Dezember 1716
- 52r-55v Friedrich Hertling (I), 19. Dezember 1716 - 22. Dezember 1718
- 56r-57r Johannes Kauer, 22. Dezember 1718 - 22. Dezember 1719
- 57r-58r Mathias Hoenicke, 22. Dezember 1719 - 20. Dezember 1720
- 58r-59v Carl Otto Thyllius, 20. Dezember 1720 - 20. Dezember 1721
- 59v-60v Caspar Wilhelm Beusser (I), 20. Dezember 1721 - 19. Dezember 1722
- 60v-62r Christian Hartsoeker, Caspar Wilhelm Beusser (Prorektor), 19. Dezember 1722 - 19. Dezember 1723
- 62v-64r Theodor Weber, 19. Dezember 1723 - 20. Dezember 1724
- 64r-65r Adolph Bern(h)ard(s), 20. Dezember 1724 - 20. Dezember 1725
- 65v-67r Daniel Nebel (III), 20. Dezember 1725 - 20. Dezember 1726
- 67v-69v Friedrich Gerhard von Lüneschlos (IV), 20. Dezember 1726 - 20. Dezember 1727
- 70r-72r Ludwig Christian Mieg (II), 20. Dezember 1727 - 20. Dezember 1728
- 72v-74v Friedrich Hertling (II), 20. Dezember 1728 - 20. Dezember 1729
- 75r-76v Caspar Wilhelm Beusser (II), 20. Dezember 1729 - 20. Dezember 1730
- 76v-79r Philipp Ludwig Pastoir (II), 20. Dezember 1730 - 20. Dezember 1731
- 79r-80v Adam Gerich, 20. Dezember 1731 - 20. Dezember 1732
- 80v-85r Franz Christian Hennemann (I), 20. Dezember 1732 - 20. Dezember 1733
- 85r-88r Franz Besenella, Franz Christian Hennemann (Prorektor), 20. Dezember 1733 - 20. Dezember 1734
- 88r-90v Jodocus Eimer, 20. Dezember 1734 - 20. Dezember 1735
- 91r-94v Johann Heinrich Hottinger d. J. (I), 20. Dezember 1735 - 20. Dezember 1736
- 95r-97v Friedrich Hertling (III), 20. Dezember 1736 - 20. Dezember 1737
- 98r-100v Wilhelm Bernhard Nebel (I), 20. Dezember 1737 - 20. Dezember 1738
- 101r-102v Theodor Schneider, 20. Dezember 1738 - 20. Dezember 1739
- 103r-105r Christoph Kirn (I), 20. Dezember 1739 - 20. Dezember 1740
- 105v-107r Adam Staudinger, 20. Dezember 1740 - 20. Dezember 1741
- 107v-111r Karl Eugen Luchini von Spiessendorf, 20. Dezember 1741 - 20. Dezember 1742
- 111r-114r Philipp Ludwig Pastoir (III), 20. Dezember 1742 - 20. Dezember 1743
- 114v-116v Heinrich Hillman, 20. Dezember 1743 - 19. Dezember 1744
- 117r-118v Franz Alef (I), 19. Dezember 1744 - 20. Dezember 1745
- 118v-120v Wilhelm Bernhard Nebel (II), 20. Dezember 1745 - 20. Dezember 1746
- 121r-122r Joseph Engelmohr, 20. Dezember 1746 - 20. Dezember 1747
- 122v-126r Johann Heinrich Hottinger d. J. (II), 20. Dezember 1747 - 20. Dezember 1748
- 126v-128v Franz Ignaz Wedekind, 20. Dezember 1748 - 20. Dezember 1749
- 129r-131r Franz Joseph von Oberkamp (I), 20. Dezember 1749 - 20. Dezember 1750
- 131v-133r Ignaz Hartung (I), 20. Dezember 1750 - 20. Dezember 1751
- 133v-135r Christoph Kirn (II), 20. Dezember 1751 - 20. Dezember 1752
- 135r-138r Franz Christian Hennemann (II), 20. Dezember 1752 - 20. Dezember 1753
- 138v-141r Georg Matthäus Gattenhoff (I), 20. Dezember 1753 - 20. Dezember 1754
- 141v-145v Christian Mayer (I), 20. Dezember 1754 - 20. Dezember 1755
- 146r-148r Christian Brünings, 20. Dezember 1755 - 20. Dezember 1756
- 148r-151r Peter Gallade, 20. Dezember 1756 - 20. Dezember 1757
- 151r-153r Franz Joseph von Oberkamp (II), 20. Dezember 1757 - 20. Dezember 1758
- 153v-156r Hieronymus Calemberg, 20. Dezember 1758 - 20. Dezember 1759
- 156v-158r Ignaz Hartung (II), 20. Dezember 1759 - 20. Dezember 1760
- 158v-162r Franz Alef (II), 20. Dezember 1760 - 20. Dezember 1761
- 162v-164r Georg Matthäus Gattenhoff (II), 20. Dezember 1761 - 20. Dezember 1762
- 164v-166v Johannes Martin Ignaz Kreussler, 20. Dezember 1762 - 20. Dezember 1763
- 167r-169r Philipp Gerhard Rieger, 20. Dezember 1763 - 20. Dezember 1764
- 169v-174r Johann Wilhelm Anton Dahmen, 20. Dezember 1764 - 20. Dezember 1765
- 174v-177r Franz Innozenz Gabriel Schoenmezel, 20. Dezember 1765 - 20. Dezember 1766
- 177v-181r Christian Mayer (II), 20. Dezember 1766 - 20. Dezember 1767
- 181v-183v Johannes Caspar Jung, 20. Dezember 1767 - 20. Dezember 1768
- 184r-185v Georg Joseph Wedekind (I), 20. Dezember 1768 - 20. Dezember 1769
- 186r-191r Hubert Harrer (I), 20. Dezember 1769 - 20. Dezember 1770
- 191v-194r Carl Büttinghausen (I), 20. Dezember 1770 - 20. Dezember 1771
- 194v-196r Ignaz Hartung (III), 20. Dezember 1771 - 20. Dezember 1772
- 196v-198r Johann Thaddäus Müller, 20. Dezember 1772 - 20. Dezember 1773
- 198v-200v Franz Philipp von Oberkamp (I), 20. Dezember 1773 - 20. Dezember 1774
- 200v-202v Joseph Agricola, 20. Dezember 1774 - 20. Dezember 1775
- 202v-205r Carl Büttinghausen (II), 20. Dezember 1775 - 20. Dezember 1776
- 205v-208r Johannes Franz Nikolaus von Spengel, 20. Dezember 1776 - 20. Dezember 1777
- 208v-210r Daniel Wilhelm Nebel (I), 20. Dezember 1777 - 19. Dezember 1778
- 210v-212v Johannes Schwab, 19. Dezember 1778 - 12. Februar 1780
- 213r-214v Joseph Kleiner, 12. Februar 1780 - 20. Dezember 1780
- 214v-217v Ignaz Anton Reichert, 20. Dezember 1780 - 20. Dezember 1781
- 218r-222v Georg Matthäus Gattenhoff (III), 20. Dezember 1781 - 20. Dezember 1782
- 222v-224r Johannes Carl Casimir Wundt, 20. Dezember 1782 - 20. Dezember 1783
- 225r-227r Dominik Friedrich Gottlieb Theophil Heddäus (I), 20. Dezember 1783 - 20. Dezember 1784
- 227v-230r Georg Friedrich Zentner, 20. Dezember 1784 - 20. Dezember 1785
- 230v-232r Hubert Harrer (II), 20. Dezember 1785 - 20. Dezember 1786
- 232v-233v Georg Adolph Suckow, 20. Dezember 1786 - 20. Dezember 1787
- 234r-236r Borromäus Theisen, 20. Dezember 1787 - 20. Dezember 1788
- 245r-248r Dominik Friedrich Gottlieb Theophil Heddäus (II), 20. Dezember 1791 - 20. Dezember 1792
- 248v-250v Matthäus Kübel, 20. Dezember 1792 - 20. Dezember 1793
- 251r-252v Daniel Wilhelm Nebel (II), 20. Dezember 1793 - 20. Dezember 1794
- 253r-254r Jakob Schmitt, 20. Dezember 1794 - 20. Dezember 1795
- 254v-255v Joannes a Cruce, 20. Dezember 1795 - 20. Dezember 1796
- 256r-258r Johann Jakob Joseph Kirschbaum, 20. Dezember 1796 - 20. Dezember 1797
- 258v-261v Franz Anton Mai, 20. Dezember 1797 - 20. Dezember 1798
- 262r-263r Johannes Koch, 20. Dezember 1798 - 19. Dezember 1799
- 264r-266r Daniel Ludwig Wundt, 19. Dezember 1799 - 20. Dezember 1800
- 266v-270r Franz Gambsjäger, 22. Dezember 1800 - 20. Dezember 1801
- 270v-272r Daniel Wilhelm Nebel (III), 20. Dezember 1801 - 20. Dezember 1802
- 273r-276v Georg Adolph Suckow (Prorektor), 20. Dezember 1802 - 20. Dezember 1803
- 277r-281r Franz Martin Schnappinger (Prorektor), 21. Dezember 1803 - 20. Dezember 1804
- 281v-286v Carl Ignaz Wedekind (Prorektor), 20. Dezember 1804 - 20. Dezember 1805
- 287r-298v Anton Friedrich Justus Thibaut (Prorektor (I)), 21. Dezember 1805 - 31. März 1807
- 299r-311v Christoph Reinhard Dietrich Martin (Prorektor), 01. April 1807 - 19. April 1808
- 311v-331r Georg Arnold Heise (Prorektor), 20. April 1808 - 04. April 1809
- 331v-361r Christian von Langsdorf(f) (Prorektor), 04. April 1809 - 12. Juni 1810
- 363v-364r Verzeichnis jüdischer Studenten, 17. Mai 1724 - 28. Oktober 1804
- Einband
- Rücken
- Maßstab/Farbkeil